Financial history MANSFIELD UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1164177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £17.26k £4.84k £20.36k £26.21k £24.12k
Total expenditure £18.21k £5.09k £21.86k £23.74k £23.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £400 £600 £350