Trustees MANSFIELD UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1164177

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Huckerby | Chair | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Henshaw | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Lawes | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irena Dubowski | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ford | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stella Hall | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Miller | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Harrison | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gill Mallinder | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Hatton | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip William Tucker | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA PEGG | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.