Accounts and annual returns BUTTERFLY CHILDREN'S HOSPICES CIO

Charity number: 1167633
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 May 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 May 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On Time