FURNITURE FOR EDUCATION WORLDWIDE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FEW have sent containers to eleven different countries full of surplus educational school furniture giving some of the most desperate children in the world a better chance of an education. FEW have sent fire engines and in conjunction UNISON sent ambulances to the Gambia. FEW have been involved sinking bore holes in Uganda and the Gambia, so that the locals have clean water to drink.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Cambodia
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Pakistan
- The Gambia
Governance
- 12 October 2016: CIO registration
- FEW CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY ELLIOTT BURNS MBE | Chair | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roy Longstaff | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Burns | Trustee | 11 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
GARY LEE BURNS | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philip Hubert Matthew Crowe | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Liam KILBRIDE | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Bolam | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CARL DAVID SANDERSON | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Keith Bolam | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.79k | £45.22k | £18.22k | £900 | £1.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.08k | £24.26k | £33.45k | £900 | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 186 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 200 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2022 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2022 | 319 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN DEPRIVED COUNTRIES AROUND THE WORLD THAT HAVE VERY LITTLE OR NO FACILITIES BY SENDING REDUNDANT AND SURPLUS FURNITURE, EDUCATIONAL, IT AND OTHER EQUIPMENT TO EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING ESTABLISHMENTS AND PROJECTS TO BENEFIT ANY LOCAL COMMUNITY WHICH IS IN NEED IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE TO ENSURE IN SO FAR AS IT IS REASONABLY PRACTICABLE THAT NO ITEMS SHALL BE SENT TO OR VIA PRIVATE OR PROFIT MAKING ORGANISATIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Boadicea Park
Preston Road
Ribchester
PRESTON
PR3 3XL
- Phone:
- 01282426331
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window