BACKLIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance education in the fields of visual, creative and applied arts by the establishment and maintenance of an art gallery and in particular the provision of studies and galleries where art may be practiced, created and exhibited and public exhibitions of art for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 20 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Vincent Chettle | Chair | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roberta Beattie | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jay Harris | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Isobel Elstob | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ismail Khokon | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Teresa Forde | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Anderson | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Alexander Jovcic-Sas | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.15k | £265.37k | £250.77k | £207.97k | £243.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.98k | £157.45k | £242.67k | £173.33k | £239.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.00k | £27.48k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 DEC 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE FIELDS OF VISUAL, CREATIVE AND APPLIED ARTS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ART GALLERY AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF; STUDIOS AND GALLERIES WHERE ART MAY BE PRACTICED, CREATED OR EXHIBITED AND PUBLIC EXHIBITIONS OF ART FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
BACKLIT
Alfred House
Ashley Street
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 1JG
- Phone:
- 01158372426
- Email:
- info@backlit.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window