Trustees HANSLOPE VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 1165557

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Eric Sorrell CSTJ | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Bone | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Raymond Leakey Mr | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann PARRETT | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Millington | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Winnifrid Parry | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Stewart Carter | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Glanville | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jenni ALLIS | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Norman Irvine | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.