Financial history FREEDOM MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1165482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/09/2019 29/09/2020 29/09/2021 29/09/2022 29/09/2023
Total gross income £10.80k £8.00k £8.00k £8.00k £8.10k
Total expenditure £11.77k £10.57k £9.77k £10.90k £8.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A