POINT-VIRGULE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education for the public benefit by teaching the French language and French culture to children in North London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Camden
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 22 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VAMORY TRAORE | Chair | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laetitia Houget | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Marco | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Horlait | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hubert Jeaneau | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.50k | £19.95k | £13.51k | £29.18k | £34.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.63k | £17.86k | £13.33k | £22.58k | £31.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY TEACHING THE FRENCH LANGUAGE AND FRENCH CULTURE, HERITAGE AND HISTORY TO RESIDENTS IN ISLINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CLASSES AND THROUGH ORGANISING ASSOCIATED EVENTS SUCH AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Better Space
127 Farringdon Road
London
EC1R 3DA
- Phone:
- 07492363341
- Email:
- contact@point-virgule.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window