VETERANS EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 November 2015: CIO registration
- UK GI BILL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RUTH LEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ESTHER DONAGHEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF HONOURABLY DISCHARGED VETERANS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM ARMED FORCES IN SUCH WAYS AND BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
215 HIGH ROAD
LEYTON
LONDON
E15 2BY
- Phone:
- +97470284782
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window