Accounts and annual returns MISS DIVA FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1164411
Charity reporting is overdue by 972 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 972 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 972 days
Annual return 30 November 2020 21 January 2022 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 21 January 2022 113 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 21 October 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 21 October 2020 21 days late Download Open in new window