Financial history Redstone Foundation

Charity Number: 1173078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £10.00k £10.00k £15.02k £35 £1.50k
Total expenditure £7.45k £1.90k £26.97k £2.10k £1.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A