Accounts and annual returns STUDIO TEN ART PROJECT

Charity number: 1165432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 July 2024 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 July 2024 268 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 November 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 November 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 December 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 December 2020 32 days late Download Open in new window