STUDIO TEN ART PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Art Gallery and 14 Studios which will offer free accommodation for budding artists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 04 February 2016: CIO registration
- STUDIO TEN (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Hudson | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MELVYN ROBERT PILGRIM | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM LONGLEY | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2024 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2024 | 268 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1. TO ADVANCE THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF STUDIO AND GALLERY SPACE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND SERVICES (FREE OF CHARGE OR AT REDUCED RATES) FOR THOSE WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE ACCESS TO SUCH FACILITIES AND SERVICES; 3.2. TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND FACILITIES TO HELP SUCH BENEFICIARIES TO BECOME EMPLOYED OR SELF-SUPPORTING THROUGH THEIR ART; AND 3.3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS BY MAINTAINING GALLERY SPACES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1221A LONDON ROAD
LEIGH-ON-SEA
ESSEX
SS9 3JB
- Phone:
- 07802453178
- Email:
- MELPILGRIM@LIVE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window