Accounts and annual returns BASH LOCAL

Charity number: 1163811
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2016 28 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 02 June 2017 On Time