Financial history DAISY PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1166033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £103.66k £201.49k £291.00k £269.84k £497.72k
Total expenditure £85.92k £182.87k £253.00k £290.51k £398.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k £36.13k £240.22k £191.03k £144.65k