MUSLIM WORLD LEAGUE LONDON OFFICE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DAILY WORSHIP, WEEKLY LESSONS IN ARABIC AND QUR'AN, PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND KNOWLEDGE ABOUT ISLAM TO THOSE WHO REQUEST IT, OCCASIONAL EDUCATIONAL CONFERENCES, SEMINARS AND EXHIBITIONS ON ISLAMIC THEMES, INCLUDING INTERFAITH EVENTS, INTERACTION WITH AND ASSISTANCE TO UK BASED REGISTERED ISLAMIC CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- CECF (Working name)
- CULTURAL EDUCATION COMMUNICATION FORUM (Working name)
- MWLLO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
H.E. Dr MOHAMMAD BIN ABDULKARIM ALISSA | Chair | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIR IQBAL ABDUL KARIM MUSSA SACRANIE | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOHAMMAD SADEEQ NOJOUM | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
H.E. Dr ABDULRAHMAN BIN ABDULLAH AL ZAID | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr HASHEM MOHAMMED ALI MAHDI | Trustee | 22 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £652.95k | £577.92k | £699.85k | £333.70k | £436.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £639.29k | £482.10k | £493.60k | £580.07k | £715.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £118.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £500.58k | £410.34k | £418.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £152.37k | £48.93k | £150.33k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £118.65k | £130.56k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £639.29k | £482.10k | £493.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £35.02k | £36.33k | £40.46k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £5.00k | £2.00k | £1.90k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Apr 2017 as amended on 25 May 2020 as amended on 16 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND MORE PARTICULARLY IN THE CITY OF LONDON AND THE BRITISH ISLES: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT CONCERNING THE TEACHINGS AND RELIGION OF ISLAM; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE FAITH AND RELIGIOUS PRACTICES OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOUR SUNNI SCHOOLS OF THOUGHT; (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF ANY PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR NATIONALITY, RACE, ETHNIC ORIGIN AND RELIGIOUS BELIEFS; (D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; (II) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS; (III) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RELIGION; (E) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (II) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (III) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE; (F) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MWLLO
46 GOODGE STREET
LONDON
W1T 4LU
- Phone:
- 02076367568
- Email:
- info@mwllo.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window