THE BROADWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage high standards of architecture and planning in or affecting the village of Broadway and surrounding areas To educate the public in the geography, history, natural history and architecture of the area of benefit To encourage and secure the preservation, protection, development and improvement of features of general public amenity or of historic interest in the area of benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 05 April 2016: CIO registration
- 13 March 2019: Funds received from 252251 THE BROADWAY TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Peter Hotten QC | Chair | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julieanne McGrigor | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Joseph Morris | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Kirkby Peace | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Fulton Llb | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony de Navarro QC | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN JAMES DARRAGH GOLDSMITH BA | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAKIN | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.44k | £7.73k | £15.39k | £3.91k | £7.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19k | £13.34k | £4.41k | £7.27k | £8.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
'THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST SHALL BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY AND THOSE VISITING BROADWAY, AS FOLLOWS: (A) TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND PLANNING IN OR AFFECTING THE VILLAGE OF BROADWAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"). (B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (C) TO ENCOURAGE AND SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR OF HISTORIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (D) THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF PUBLIC AMENITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 High Street
BROADWAY
Worcestershire
WR12 7AJ
- Phone:
- 07973889863
- Website:
-
broadwaytrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window