Trustees THE BROADWAY TRUST
Charity Number: 1166355

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Peter Hotten QC | Chair | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julieanne McGrigor | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Joseph Morris | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Kirkby Peace | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Fulton Llb | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony de Navarro QC | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN JAMES DARRAGH GOLDSMITH BA | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAKIN | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.