Accounts and annual returns POWERHOUSE CHURCH

Charity number: 1163795
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 02 September 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 02 September 2024 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 04 September 2023 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 04 September 2023 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 28 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 29 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 28 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 28 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 03 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 03 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window