Financial history THE BRIDGE RECOVERY COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1167634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/06/2020 01/06/2021 01/06/2022 01/06/2023 01/06/2024
Total gross income £39.84k £25.59k £41.78k £49.73k £38.70k
Total expenditure £33.79k £32.14k £33.65k £37.46k £40.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A