Trustees THE BRIDGE RECOVERY COMMUNITY
Charity number: 1167634

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Dove | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Milton | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver James Wake Jennings | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bielanski | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Chichester Williams | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Bell | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Miller | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Edward Crosland | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.