TALISMAN THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Theatre and performing arts within the local community by presenting performances and providing training and experience to members, especially youth members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £1,950 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 17 December 2015: CIO registration
- 01 September 2017: Funds received from 239889 TALISMAN THEATRE COMPANY
- TALISMAN THEATRE AND ARTS COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel William Elliott | Chair | 30 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Kerrie McCann | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Corrina Jacob | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Gowers | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Duckham | Trustee | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.50k | £69.04k | £143.78k | £317.41k | £177.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.24k | £36.24k | £67.74k | £111.44k | £151.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.73k | N/A | £32.50k | £135.00k | £1.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 17 DEC 2015 AMENDED ON 17 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFORE PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Talisman Theatre & Arts Centre
Barrow Road
KENILWORTH
Warwickshire
CV8 1EG
- Phone:
- 01926856548
- Email:
- chair@talismantheatre.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window