SECOND CHANCE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the the relief and assistance of the homeless and people in crisis throughout Medway and surrounding areas. Second Chance aims to stop the revolving door of evictions for vulnerable families, providing services which include awareness, education, incentives and support for landlords; financial education and varied support programs towards independent living in the Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 26 April 2016: CIO registration
- Second Chance Medway (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caitlin Webb | Chair | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bradley Swift | Trustee | 23 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Le-Page | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steven Keevil | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nina Nina Gurung | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Jennings | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Guy Alexander Jordan | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Candice Alexandra Frances Penfold | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
PENNY KEEVIL | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/05/2020 | 14/05/2021 | 14/05/2022 | 14/05/2023 | 14/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.37k | £56.61k | £107.44k | £122.86k | £154.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.34k | £45.77k | £101.92k | £119.75k | £141.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 May 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 May 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 May 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 May 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 May 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 May 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THE HOMELESS AND THOSE AT RISK OF BECOMING HOMELESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE APPROPRIATE TO HELP PREVENT EVICTIONS AND HELP PEOPLE TOWARDS INDEPENDENT LIVING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Second Chance Medway Community Hub
105 High Street
Chatham
ME4 4DH
- Phone:
- 01634 408840
- Email:
- penny@2ndchancemedway.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window