TIMOTHY WELLS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the TWCT are the advancement of the education of persons in East Africa; the relief of poverty, hardship and distress worldwide, in particular amongst persons who are persecuted for their Christian faith and persons in East Africa; the protection and preservation of the environment and of endangered species of animals; the relief of those suffering from Alzheimers or from cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
Governance
- 07 January 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY WESTON WELLS | Chair | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA JAYNE SNELLGROVE | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE KATE WESTON HALL | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.51k | £27.57k | £28.24k | £29.89k | £36.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.77k | £25.00k | £28.30k | £29.33k | £37.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 APR 2015
Charitable objects
2.2 THE OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION OF THE FOREGOING: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS IN EAST AFRICA; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS WORLDWIDE, AND IN PARTICULAR AMONGST PERSONS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHO ARE PERSECUTED FOR THEIR CHRISTIAN FAITH AND PERSONS IN EAST AFRICA; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; (D) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRESERVATION OF ENDANGERED SPECIES OF ANIMALS; (E) THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM ALZHEIMER?S DISEASE OR FROM CANCER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 HIGHLEVER ROAD
LONDON
W10 6PW
- Phone:
- 07739182861
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window