Financial history CRPS UK

Charity number: 1165597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.29k £21.17k £12.14k £2.89k £6.69k
Total expenditure £16.55k £12.92k £5.85k £12.47k £3.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A