Financial history WHITLEY BAY SPORTING CLUB

Charity number: 1164922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £179.72k £167.98k £188.71k £253.11k £283.35k
Total expenditure £179.68k £115.40k £198.27k £228.87k £273.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A