WHITLEY BAY SPORTING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPORTING ACTIVITY TO ALL AGE GROUPS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
206 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 17 December 2015: CIO registration
- WBBC (Working name)
- WHITLEY BAY BOYS' CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT NIXON | Chair | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Morrison | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Coughlin | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Davidson | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clint Milnes | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ORAN ROBSON | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.72k | £167.98k | £188.71k | £253.11k | £283.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.68k | £115.40k | £198.27k | £228.87k | £273.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION FOR HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Hepscott Drive
Whitley Bay
NE25 9XJ
- Phone:
- 07443 439715
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window