Rahela Trust for Afghan women's education

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rahela Trust provides financial support to enable young Afghan disadvantaged women to pursue higher education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 25 February 2016: CIO registration
- FARKHUNDA TRUST (FTAWE) (Working name)
- FARKHUNDA TRUST FOR AFGHAN WOMEN'S EDUCATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mel Bradley | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marika Patrick Theros | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sear Sadat | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Rennie | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
KAMINI PAUL | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Liz Mermin | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.38k | £47.68k | £52.17k | £34.08k | £61.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.27k | £35.30k | £36.41k | £37.19k | £46.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 25 Feb 2016 as amended on 01 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN IN AFGHANISTAN BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6
Station Parade
Northolt Road
South Harrow
Harrow
HA2 8HB
- Phone:
- 02037198185
- Email:
- info@rahelatrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window