HOME-START EAST SURREY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start East Surrey offers support, friendship and practical help to parents with young children in East Surrey and its environs. We recruit and train volunteers who are parents themselves to visit families with at least one child under five at home, and offer them informal, friendly and confidential support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,936 from 1 government contract(s) and £3,400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 29 October 2015: Standard registration
- 30 December 2016: Funds received from 1033322 HOME START EAST SURREY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carla Brackstone | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tina Michelle Lockwood | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Ann Limond | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDWINA HUGHES | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA BARTON | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MATHIESON | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.19k | £158.68k | £161.35k | £142.71k | £201.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.48k | £155.46k | £162.97k | £173.30k | £201.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £35.43k | £20.94k | N/A | £21.24k | £20.94k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | £20.94k | N/A | £3.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 MAY 2011 as amended on 07 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; C TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF EAST SURREY AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 2 & 3
Second Floor
Tower House
3 Cromwell Road
Redhill
RH1 1RT
- Phone:
- 01737770220
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window