Financial history SAVING YORKSHIRE'S DOGS RESCUE

Charity number: 1167291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £53.94k £71.99k £132.57k £88.54k £142.70k
Total expenditure £52.42k £67.85k £116.61k £148.97k £148.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A