WIMBLEDON COMMUNITY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a weekly opportunity for amateur musicians to come together to play orchestral music in a relaxed inclusive environment. We encourage late-starters, students, regular and occasional players, from diverse social or ethnic backgrounds, and people with disabilities. We provide rehearsal facilities, present concerts, support the local church and give soloist opportunities to the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Merton
Governance
- 28 October 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Anthony Blech | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Brown | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret Wing | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Josephine Peveril Sturge | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mala Saye | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Sterlini | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Nicholas Hillson MA LLM AKC | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Bradshaw | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.19k | £5.78k | £9.37k | £10.44k | £13.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.61k | £5.18k | £11.44k | £11.86k | £10.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUN 2015 as amended on 19 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Parkway
LONDON
SW20 9HF
- Phone:
- 07970165907
- Email:
- wimbledonco@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window