AFRICAN INSTITUTE OF INTEGRATED MEDICINE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote Health and relieve sickness for public benefit by offering patients a range of alternative medicine to include physiotherapy, homeopathy,osteopathy,acupuncture, counselling and nutritional advice as integrated care along side doctors and nurses in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Tanzania
Governance
- African Institute of Integrative Medicine (Working name)
- AIIM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2017 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.00k | £5.00k | £29.49k | £13.90k | £507 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £976 | £7.22k | £20.79k | £9.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 18 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 18 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT BY OFFERING PATIENTS HOMEOPATHY, OSTEOPATHY, ACUPUNCTURE, COUNSELLING AND NUTRITIONAL ADVICE AS PART OF INTEGRATED CARE WITH CONVENTIONAL DOCTORS, DENTISTS AND OPTICIANS IN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE KILIMANJARO REGION OF TANZANIA.
Area of benefit
IN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE KILIMANJARO REGION OF TANZANIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window