LINCOLN TRIDENT SWIMMING ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LTSA provides a flexible supported development pathway for swimmers by providing coached swimming training sessions. Training sessions cover a range of abilities and age groups, focussed on inclusive swimming and continued participation, not just the traditional main target of competing. LTSA also supports, trains and mentors volunteers to learn or to improve/develop their teaching/coaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 31 March 2016: CIO registration
- LTSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEN STRATHON | Chair | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marie Mulholland | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jackson | Trustee | 30 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Copland | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Parsons | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE JANE STRATHON | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.72k | £15.99k | £14.04k | £18.35k | £24.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.11k | £12.50k | £15.43k | £21.67k | £23.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 31 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO SHALL BE: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT (THE ADVANCMENT OF WHICH PROMOTES HEALTH BY INVOLVING PHYSICAL OR MENTAL SKILL OR EXERTION) IN PARTICULAR THE AMATEUR SPORT OF SWIMMING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND 3.1.2 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR: 3.1.2.1 THE TEACHING, DEVELOPMENT AND PRACTICE OF SWIMMING, DIVING, SYNCHRO, OPEN WATER, WATER POLO AND, WHERE APPROPRIATE, TO ENABLE THE CIO’S MEMBERS TO COMPETE; AND 3.1.2.2 THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF TEACHERS/COACHES OF SWIMMING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 MOORLAND CRESCENT
LINCOLN
LN6 7NL
- Phone:
- 07719120525
- Email:
- ltsa@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window