Financial history MASJID TALHA

Charity number: 1166030
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £259.56k £318.77k £202.00k £219.38k £342.08k
Total expenditure £164.18k £32.94k £26.62k £15.46k £456.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A