ACTIVE ESSEX FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1166665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Active Essex Foundation has been set up to use physical activity and Sport to engage and support the most deprived communities across Essex. We work in partnership with local organisations to engage harder to reach communities and under-represented groups across our county to address inequalities, empower communities, break down barriers, and improve outcomes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Southend-on-sea
  • Thurrock

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 April 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • AEF (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katie Heron Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Leigh Jon Norris Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
MRS JENNI TOMBLIN Trustee 05 October 2016
None on record
ROBERT HAYNE Trustee 11 May 2016
None on record
RAY GOODING Trustee 11 May 2016
CIBSE BENEVOLENT FUND TRUST
Received: On time
JASON FERGUS Trustee 11 May 2016
None on record
ROBERT MCLINTOCK Trustee 21 April 2016
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
BRENTWOOD SCHOOL CIO
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52.01k £102.59k £238.45k £251.85k £787.25k
Total expenditure £19.11k £83.26k £13.98k £396.58k £635.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.35k £180.00k £100.80k £411.69k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.52k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £776.73k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.00k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £635.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.12m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £390.32k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ACTIVE ESSEX Foundation
146 New London Road
CHELMSFORD
CM2 0AW
Phone:
07894081626