GITA INTERNATIONAL TRUST ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The distribution of books written by His Divine Grace AC Bhaktivedanta Swami Prabhupada.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 June 2016: Standard registration
- 10 January 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- GITA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2017 | 30/10/2018 | 30/10/2019 | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £327 | £13.35k | £2 | £626 | £157 | |
|
Total expenditure | £246 | £10.56k | £73 | £284 | £5.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF KRISHNA CONSCIOUSNESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF: (1) BROADCASTING THE TEACHINGS OF HIS DIVINE GRACE. A C BHAKTIVEDANTA SWAMI PRABHUPADA AS PRESENTED IN HIS ORIGINAL UNEDITED TRANSLATIONS TO ENGLISH OF THE BHAGAVAD GITA AS IT IS, AND SHNMAD BHAGAVATAM; (2) ADVANCING THE PUBLIC'S UNDERSTANDING OF THE TEACHING OF HIS DIVINE GRACE A C BHAKTIVEDANTA SWAMI PRABHUPADA IN THE UK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH CLASSES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL FORUMS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE OF HIS DIVINE GRACE A C BHAKTIVEDANTA SWAMI PRABHUPADA; (3) SUPPORTING THE FUNDING OF CHARITIES THAT ARE DEDICATED TO PROMULGATING THE TEACHING OF KRISHNA CONSCIOUSNESS THROUGH THE ORIGINAL TEXTS OF HIS DIVINE GRACE A C BHAKTIVEDANTA SWAMI PRABHUPADA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window