THE ABBEY SINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the organisation are: i. to promote and develop public education in, and the appreciation of, the art and science of music ii. to provide opportunities for people in the area of Cumbria and South West Scotland to participate in music making. iii. To put on public concerts of music iv. To raise money for local charities through our musical activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 February 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerard Owen Kelly | Chair | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ELIZABETH DUTHIE | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phyllis James | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Gray | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.34k | £548 | £1 | £3.49k | £5.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.55k | £1.03k | £1.47k | £6.03k | £5.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MARCH 1973 AS AMENDED 11 OCTOBER 1977 AS AMENDED ON 27 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
TO PERFORM CHORAL MUSIC AT A HIGH STANDARD AND TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION THEREOF BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Eden Mount
CARLISLE
CA3 9LZ
- Phone:
- 01228 534481
- Email:
- abbeysingers@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window