NUR CULTURAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cultural education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 January 2017: Standard registration
- NUT CULTURAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fikret Gultekin | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
TAYYIP DEMIR | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
SADIN KILIC | Trustee | 25 June 2009 |
|
|
||||
SALIH BASATOGRUL | Trustee | 25 June 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2021 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.52k | £38.25k | £48.08k | £420.77k | £455.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.11k | £32.41k | £49.33k | £75.22k | £425.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.04k | £1.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 December 2022 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 266 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JUN 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 OCT 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE PROVISION OF ESOL COURSES FOR ADULTS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
70A WILLOUGHBY LANE
LONDON
N17 0SP
- Phone:
- 07429067649
- Email:
- INFO@NCE.ORG.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window