Financial history BUSINESS FOR YOUTH IN NEWTON-LE-WILLOWS

Charity number: 1166202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £48.39k £36.68k £22.49k £22.58k £14.29k
Total expenditure £46.71k £32.66k £24.04k £24.83k £18.97k
Income from government contracts £6.65k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A