FAITH HOPE & CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefits of young adults with learning difficulities by the provision of facilities for training and work experience. To relieve the needs of young adults with learning difficulties by the provision of facilities for training, work experience and vocational skills in a charity shop selling good quality donated items.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 04 April 2016: CIO registration
- Not just a shop (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Millitt | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Travis | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jeffcock | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN BARTLEY | Trustee | 05 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.41k | £5.23k | £11.95k | £17.35k | £22.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.04k | £8.01k | £14.30k | £10.29k | £19.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG ADULTS WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR TRAINING AND WORK EXPERIENCE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Deepwell View
Halfway
SHEFFIELD
S20 4SP
- Phone:
- 01142489865
- Email:
- karen.pemberton@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window