BURY DROP IN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SERVE THE HOMELESS & VULNERABLE HOSPITALITY - PROVIDE HOT FOOD AND DRINKS, SANDWICHES ETC BEFRIENDING- LISTEN TO GUESTS? STORIES AND DISCUSS THEIR NEEDS. SIGNPOST THE NEEDY TO THE AVAILABLE AGENCIES IN HALL ON THE DAY, & TO THE MANY OTHER AGENCIES THAT PROVIDE SUPPORT IN BURY ST EDMUNDS PROVIDE ANY AVAILABLE CLOTHING, SLEEPING BAGS, TOILETRIES, TENTS THAT HAVE BEEN DONATED BY LOCAL CHURCHES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £14,210 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 January 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROBERT WILLIAM BARCHAM GREEN | Chair | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Green | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Louis Sutherland | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard John MINNS | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANNE BURNETT | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Michael Ryall | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Anthea Joy MARSHALL | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FRANK BONNETT | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.22k | £47.16k | £40.88k | £68.15k | £83.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.87k | £41.05k | £34.58k | £69.65k | £85.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.83k | £22.29k | N/A | £30.21k | £14.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN BURY ST EDMUNDS, SUFFOLK AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF PROVIDING A WARM, SAFE AND WELCOMING HAVEN WHERE HOT MEALS AND DRINKS ARE SERVED AND WHERE A VARIETY OF AGENCIES AND INDIVIDUALS CAN BE ON HAND TO OFFER BEFRIENDING PLUS ADVICE ON HOUSING, DEBT AND BENEFITS OR HELP WITH HEALTH PROBLEMS INCLUDING DRUG AND ALCOHOL ISSUES AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED TO THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office B
Hoste House
United Reformed Church
Whiting Street
Bury St Edmunds
IP33 1NR
- Phone:
- 01284 731011
- Email:
- info@burydropin.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window