Accounts and annual returns BLYTH COMMUNITY ROWING CLUB

Charity number: 1164860
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 March 2025 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 March 2025 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 December 2024 314 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 December 2024 679 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days