Financial history BLYTH COMMUNITY ROWING CLUB

Charity number: 1164860
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £360 £480 £460
Total expenditure £797 £797 £496 £348 £407
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A