HERNE BAY COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1165148
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide low cost affordable counselling for everyone, within the Herne Bay and surrounding areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £81,603
Total expenditure: £85,737

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2016: CIO registration
  • 06 February 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 06 February 2025: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SHEERNESS COUNSELLING SERVICE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £30.00k £52.81k £54.20k £53.91k £81.60k
Total expenditure £27.99k £50.14k £55.72k £52.20k £85.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 14 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 14 August 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2022 28 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 28 August 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2020 24 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 24 August 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2019 19 November 2020 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 19 November 2020 80 days late
Submit annual return Open in new window