SECURING SUCCESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Securing Success supports supplementary schools in Harrow to access training, quality assurance (NRCSE Quality Mark) and mainstream curriculum funding. In addition the charity consults with schools to establish projects in NW London which benefit children who are disadvantaged or who would benefit from additional support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Brent
- Camden
- City Of Westminster
- Ealing
- Enfield
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 01 December 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PAXTON | Chair | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
AHMAD FARID MALL | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Carole Tobin | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Roberts | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.36k | £50.45k | £52.96k | £56.46k | £100.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.60k | £48.16k | £48.19k | £45.00k | £72.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SUPPORTING THE EDUCATIONAL WORK OF SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS IN NORTH WEST LONDON PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TRAINING, GUIDANCE, ADVICE AND GENERAL SUPPORT FOR TEACHING AND LEARNING.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
34A SEDGEMERE AVENUE
LONDON
N2 0SX
- Phone:
- 02084441053
- Email:
- joycollins1@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window