Financial history SPORTSCO FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1165844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £50.77k £67.45k £152.68k £140.31k £151.53k
Total expenditure £53.69k £62.12k £162.26k £153.70k £151.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A