ST MATTHEWS CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH 1999 LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the community with arrange of social events, and guided actitvities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 01 April 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Jackson | Chair | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hendy | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.49k | £1.28k | £7.02k | £11.25k | £10.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.30k | £3.62k | £5.91k | £6.22k | £8.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 April 2025 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 April 2025 | 435 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S PURPOSES ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY: THE PROVISION OF PLACES OF WORSHIP RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS BELIEF AND PRACTICES CARRYING OUT RELIGIOUS DEVOTIONAL ACTS CARRYING OUT MISSIONARY AND OUTREACH WORK
Contact information
- Address:
-
16
Clarence Road
Southend-On-Sea
Essex
SS1 1AN
- Phone:
- 07400924442
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window