EL HADJ MALICK SY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collect donations through fundraising; Provide assistance in education and medical fields; Provide disaster emergency assistance; Poverty relief; Umbrella to sub-Organizations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Bristol City
- Derbyshire
- Manchester City
- Nottinghamshire
- Slough
- Throughout London
- Senegal
- The Gambia
Governance
- 24 August 2016: CIO registration
- EMSYF (Working name)
- ELHADJ MALICK SY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDOUL AZIZ JALLOW | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAKHAN TRAORE | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
OUMOU SALL MSET QTLS | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
BABA NJIE | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2019 | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.48k | £1.53k | £1.21k | £1.30k | £2.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.07k | £1.90k | £0 | £0 | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 May 2024 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 May 2024 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 19 February 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 06 March 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 06 March 2022 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 14 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 14 March 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND ISLAMIC RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHILDREN IN SENEGAL OR BEYOND AS RESOURCES MAY ALLOW.
Area of benefit
SENEGAL WEST AFRICA OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Aspen Lane
NORTHOLT
UB5 6XB
- Phone:
- 02035567330
- Email:
- emsyf2015@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window