THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HELLINGLY AND UPPER DICKER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian church seeking to express God's love by offering services open to all including baptisms, marriages and funerals. We wish to express God's love by seeking to meet the needs of the community around us and wider afield through social action and community engagement and involvement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,590 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 23 October 2015: Previously excepted registration
- Hellingly and Upper Dicker PCC (Working name)
- HELLINGLY PCC (Previous name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL HELLINGLY (Previous name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL HELLINGLY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arthur Norman Loftus Kay | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Pope | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Clark | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Moore | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev JEREMY JONATHAN NICHOLAS SYKES | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CATHERINE LEES | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DEREK PIPER | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALISON ELIZABETH JEAN SYLVESTER | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
OLIVE RUTH LEWIS | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROL WINIFRED HAYWOOD | Trustee | 01 April 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.62k | £85.60k | £91.43k | £107.23k | £90.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.63k | £85.71k | £91.21k | £109.35k | £95.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.77k | £2.01k | £1.95k | £2.78k | £2.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957 as amended on 12 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 HAWKS ROAD
HAILSHAM
BN27 1NG
- Phone:
- 01323840826
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window