GRIMSBY, CLEETHORPES AND DISTRICT ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH, MIND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Counselling service both one to one and family, Support and Inclusion, Information, Sign Posting. Providing placements for volunteers and students at our various projects. Allotment based Horticultural Project which includes bees and chickens. Day services and provision of meeting places for a variety of other groups whom help us realise the aims and objectives of the association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £5,280 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 08 December 1977: Standard registration
- 18 August 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- THE GRIMSBY, CLEETHORPES AND DISTRICT LOCAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.19k | £153.15k | £117.89k | £89.73k | £59.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.66k | £125.16k | £137.97k | £116.02k | £102.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £5.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 03 July 2017 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 03 July 2017 | 153 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 27 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 27 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 27 August 2015 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 27 August 2015 | 208 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/09/1977 AS AMENDED ON 01/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT, IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND
Area of benefit
GRIMSBY, CLEETHORPES AND DISTRICT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window